AL HB461 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, distinctive license plates for professional firefighters, penalties
Title
Motor vehicles, distinctive license plates for professional firefighters, penalties
Sponsors
Rep. Dickie Drake [R] | Rep. Jim Patterson [R] | Sen. Jim McClendon [R] | Rep. Jim Carns [R] |
Rep. David Standridge [R] | Rep. Joe Faust [R] | Rep. Kurt Wallace [R] | Rep. Alan Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-05 | House | Lee intended to vote "Yea" |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 571 |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 570 |
2014-03-05 | House | Drake Amendment Offered |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |