AL HB45 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ten Commandments, display of on state property and at public schools, authorized, const. amend.
Title
Ten Commandments, display of on state property and at public schools, authorized, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Bridges motion to Table (Y: 61 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Bridges motion to Table (Y: 54 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Bridges motion to Table (Y: 61 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Bridges motion to Table (Y: 54 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Further Consideration |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |
2014-02-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 388 |
2014-02-20 | House | Rogers motion to Adjourn lost adopted voice vote |
2014-02-20 | House | Bridges motion to Table adopted Roll Call 387 |
2014-02-20 | House | Holmes (A) Amendment Offered |
2014-02-20 | House | Bridges motion to Table adopted Roll Call 386 |
2014-02-20 | House | Bandy Amendment Offered |
2014-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |