AL HB403 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Delivered to Governor at 2:18 p.m. on March 19, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Passed on March 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-19 - Delivered to Governor at 2:18 p.m. on March 19, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Boundaries, state, territorial waters and submerged lands, limits and boundaries, Sec. 41-1-1 am'd.
Title
Boundaries, state, territorial waters and submerged lands, limits and boundaries, Sec. 41-1-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - Sessions motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 51) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 51) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:18 p.m. on March 19, 2014. |
2014-03-19 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-243. |
2014-03-19 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2014-03-18 | House | Sessions motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 858 |
2014-03-18 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 828 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 827 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry Amendment Offered |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2014-02-20 | House | Bracy intended to vote Yea |
2014-02-20 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2014-02-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 394 |
2014-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |