AL HB402 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2014, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, Finance Director to notify each agency of anticipated allocations, quarterly allocations required, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, Children First Trust Fund receipts for State Board of Education, transferred to State General Fund for fiscal year 2014

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2014, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, Finance Director to notify each agency of anticipated allocations, quarterly allocations required, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, Children First Trust Fund receipts for State Board of Education, transferred to State General Fund for fiscal year 2014

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-07HouseIndefinitely Postponed
2013-03-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-03-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback