AL HB289 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-14)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grandparents, visitation with grandchildren, petition procedure and burden of proof established, Sec. 30-3-4.1 repealed
Title
Grandparents, visitation with grandchildren, petition procedure and burden of proof established, Sec. 30-3-4.1 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-05 | House | Hubbard (J) inadvertently voted "Yea" |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 615 |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |