AL HB27 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Burglary in the second degree, requirement that dwelling-house be lawfully occupied, removed, Sec. 13A-7-6 am'd.
Title
Burglary in the second degree, requirement that dwelling-house be lawfully occupied, removed, Sec. 13A-7-6 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Marsh table Singleton motion to recommit (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Marsh table Singleton motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 518 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 92 |
2014-01-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |