AL HB27 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Animals, cruelty, crime of aggravated cruelty to animals established, enhanced penalties, Sec. 13A-11-14 am'd

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animals, cruelty, crime of aggravated cruelty to animals established, enhanced penalties, Sec. 13A-11-14 am'd

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-20 - Faust motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Faust motion to Table (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
2013-05-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-369.
2013-05-20HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-05-20SenateSignature Requested
2013-05-20HouseEnrolled
2013-05-20SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2013-05-20HouseFaust motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1244
2013-05-20HouseConcurrence Requested
2013-05-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1136
2013-05-20SenatePittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1135
2013-05-20SenateJudiciary Amendment Offered
2013-05-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-04-24SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2013-04-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2013-04-09HouseEngrossed
2013-04-09HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 361
2013-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-04-09HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 360
2013-04-09HouseFaust first Substitute resumed
2013-04-09HouseFaust motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2013-04-09HouseFaust first Substitute Offered
2013-04-09HouseFaust motion to Table adopted Roll Call 352
2013-04-09HouseAgriculture and Forestry first Substitute Offered
2013-04-09HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2013-02-28HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2013-02-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/ACTIONHistoryResultsMac.asp?OID=79362&LABEL=HB27
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2013RS/Printfiles/HB27-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2013RS/Printfiles/HB27-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=463713&VOTE=352&BODY=1755&INST=HB27&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=463799&VOTE=360&BODY=1755&INST=HB27&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=463822&VOTE=361&BODY=1755&INST=HB27&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=476158&VOTE=1135&BODY=1753&INST=HB27&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=476159&VOTE=1136&BODY=1753&INST=HB27&SESS=1061
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=476328&VOTE=1244&BODY=1755&INST=HB27&SESS=1061

Bill Comments

feedback