AL HB214 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Pocket Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Pocket Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Talladega Co., sales and use tax outside of cities, distrib. of a portion of revenue, definition of legislative delegation further provided for, Act 91-533, 1991 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Talladega Co., sales and use tax outside of cities, distrib. of a portion of revenue, definition of legislative delegation further provided for, Act 91-533, 1991 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 56) [FAIL]
2014-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2014-01-16 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 56) [FAIL]
2014-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 49 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Pocket Vetoed |
2014-04-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:45 p.m. on April 3, 2014. |
2014-04-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1234 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2014-01-16 | House | Cosponsors intended to be added |
2014-01-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 14 |
2014-01-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |