AL HB198 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, write-in votes, procedures to count, duties to judge of probate in co. elections, Secretary of State for state election, Secs. 17-6-28, 17-12-1 am'd.
Title
Elections, write-in votes, procedures to count, duties to judge of probate in co. elections, Secretary of State for state election, Secs. 17-6-28, 17-12-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | Senate | Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections first Amendment Offered |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 16 Favorable from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections with 1 amendment |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |
2014-02-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 164 |
2014-02-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |