AL HB194 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on February 25, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on February 25, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
University of South Alabama, board of trustees, members, term decreased, chair pro tempore authorized to call special meetings, Secs. 16-55-2, 16-55-5, 16-55-6 am'd.
Title
University of South Alabama, board of trustees, members, term decreased, chair pro tempore authorized to call special meetings, Secs. 16-55-2, 16-55-5, 16-55-6 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on February 25, 2014. |
2014-02-25 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-89. |
2014-02-25 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 453 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2014-02-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 170 |
2014-02-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |