AL HB180 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Delivered to Governor at 4:45 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Delivered to Governor at 4:45 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Physicians, Medical Licensure Commission or Board of Medical Examiners, administrative fines, physicians authorize to renew licenses when paying administrative fines in installments, Sec. 34-24-383 am'd.
Title
Physicians, Medical Licensure Commission or Board of Medical Examiners, administrative fines, physicians authorize to renew licenses when paying administrative fines in installments, Sec. 34-24-383 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:45 p.m. on April 3, 2014. |
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-402. |
2014-04-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1188 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |
2014-02-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 266 |
2014-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |