AL HB18 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progress
Action: 2011-06-09 - Delivered to Governor at 11:55 p.m. on June 9, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Abortion, prohibited on or after 20 weeks postfertilization, exceptions for health of mother, Legislative findings regarding pain felt by unborn child, reports to Office of Vital Statistics, civil and criminal penalties, Alabama Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act, Sec. 22-9A-13 am'd. (2011-20570)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortion, prohibited on or after 20 weeks postfertilization, exceptions for health of mother, Legislative findings regarding pain felt by unborn child, reports to Office of Vital Statistics, civil and criminal penalties, Alabama Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act, Sec. 22-9A-13 am'd. (2011-20570)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-09 - Rich motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - McClurkin motion to Previous Question (Y: 59 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Rules petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Beason motion to Table (Y: 18 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Motion to Adopt (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Cosponsors Added (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 51) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 69 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Lee motion to Previous Question (Y: 62 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Rich motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 Delivered to Governor at 11:55 p.m. on June 9, 2011.
2011-06-09 Assigned Act No. 2011-672.
2011-06-09 Enrolled
2011-06-09 Clerk of the House Certification
2011-06-09 Signature Requested
2011-06-09 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2011-06-09 Rich motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1197
2011-06-09 Wren motion to Suspend Rule 25 adopted Voice Vote
2011-06-09 McClurkin motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1196
2011-06-09 Rich motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2011-06-09 Concurrence Requested
2011-06-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1054
2011-06-09 Beason amendment adopted Roll Call 1053.
2011-06-09 Rules petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 1052
2011-06-09 Beason tabled Sanford amendment Roll Call 1051.
2011-06-09 Sanford Amendment Offered
2011-06-09 Beason Amendment Offered
2011-06-09 Health first Substitute adopted Roll Call 1050.
2011-06-09 Health first Substitute Offered.
2011-06-09 Third Reading Passed
2011-05-05 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2011-04-12 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health
2011-04-07 Mitchell dissent filed
2011-04-07 Hubbard (M) intended to vote "Yea", Knight intended to vote "Nay" and Warren intended to vote "Abstain"
2011-04-07 Cosponsors Added
2011-04-07 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 196
2011-04-07 Lee motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 195
2011-04-07 Rich motion to Table adopted Roll Call 194
2011-04-07 Mitchell Amendment Offered
2011-04-07 Third Reading Passed
2011-03-31 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2011-03-01 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/ACTIONHistoryResultsMac.asp?OID=71319&LABEL=HB18
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2011RS/Printfiles/HB18-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/searchableinstruments/2011RS/Printfiles/HB18-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=403240&VOTE=194&BODY=1755&INST=HB18&SESS=1058
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=403241&VOTE=195&BODY=1755&INST=HB18&SESS=1058
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=403242&VOTE=196&BODY=1755&INST=HB18&SESS=1058
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=403248&VOTE=197&BODY=1755&INST=HB18&SESS=1058
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=421693&VOTE=1050&BODY=1753&INST=HB18&SESS=1058
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=421744&VOTE=1051&BODY=1753&INST=HB18&SESS=1058
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=421747&VOTE=1052&BODY=1753&INST=HB18&SESS=1058
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=421748&VOTE=1053&BODY=1753&INST=HB18&SESS=1058
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=421749&VOTE=1054&BODY=1753&INST=HB18&SESS=1058
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=422360&VOTE=1196&BODY=1755&INST=HB18&SESS=1058
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/acas/GetRollCallVoteResults.asp?MOID=422367&VOTE=1197&BODY=1755&INST=HB18&SESS=1058

Bill Comments

feedback