AL HB141 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Health
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veterinary Practice Act, definition of practice of veterinary revised to prohibit unlicensed persons from directly supervising services, spay neuter clinics included as veterinary facilities, certain nonprofit employed vets exempted from prohibition against working for unlicensed employer, Secs. 34-29-61, 34-29-87, 34-29-88 am'd.
Title
Veterinary Practice Act, definition of practice of veterinary revised to prohibit unlicensed persons from directly supervising services, spay neuter clinics included as veterinary facilities, certain nonprofit employed vets exempted from prohibition against working for unlicensed employer, Secs. 34-29-61, 34-29-87, 34-29-88 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 58 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - Todd motion to Table (Y: 53 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - Todd motion to Table (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 72 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - Todd motion to Table (Y: 22 N: 60 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2014-02-25 - House - Todd motion to Table (Y: 53 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - Todd motion to Table (Y: 40 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 72 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - Todd motion to Table (Y: 22 N: 60 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 22 Favorable from Health |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | Hurst intended to vote "Yea" on passage of bill on 17th leg day |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |
2014-02-25 | House | Engrossed |
2014-02-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 412 |
2014-02-25 | House | Todd motion to Table adopted Roll Call 411 |
2014-02-25 | House | Standridge motion to Carry Over tabled |
2014-02-25 | House | Todd motion to Table adopted Roll Call 410 |
2014-02-25 | House | Buttram Amendment Offered |
2014-02-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 409 |
2014-02-25 | House | Todd motion to Table lost Roll Call 408 |
2014-02-25 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered |
2014-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |