AL HB108 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Business personal property tax returns, Department of Revenue required to develop online electronic filing system
Title
Business personal property tax returns, Department of Revenue required to develop online electronic filing system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Blackwell motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Blackwell motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-04 - Senate - Sanford motion to Adopt (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Forwarded to Executive Department |
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-415. |
2014-04-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2014-04-03 | House | Hill motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1110 |
2014-04-03 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1206 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Blackwell motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1205 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Sanford motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Sanford Amendment Offered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Sanford motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1192 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Job Creation and Economic Development Amendment Offered |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Job Creation and Economic Development |
2014-01-16 | House | Engrossed |
2014-01-16 | House | Cosponsors intended to be added |
2014-01-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 34 |
2014-01-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 33 |
2014-01-16 | House | Wren Amendment Offered |
2014-01-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |