AK SCR25 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 193, relating to the joint administration of tobacco taxes by the state and a municipality.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 193
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14 |
2014-07-02 | Senate | 9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-23 | House | VERSION: SCR 25 |
2014-04-23 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-22 | House | PASSED Y32 E2 A6 |
2014-04-22 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2014-04-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2014-04-21 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 25 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-04-21 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- A1 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-04-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |