AK SCR18 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - PERMANENTLY FILED 3/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - PERMANENTLY FILED 3/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Joint Resolution No. 15, supporting the introduction and enactment of federal legislation acknowledging that the federal government is financially responsible under the Alaska Native Claims Settlement Act for the remediation of contaminated land subject to conveyance under the Act.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hjr 15
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 3/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 31 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | 8:39 AM 3/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-03-03 | House | VERSION: SCR 18 |
2014-03-03 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-03-03 | House | PASSED Y35 E5 |
2014-03-03 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2014-03-03 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2014-02-28 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 18 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E3 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-02-28 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
Subjects
Claims
Corporations
Environmental Concerns
Hazardous Substances
Hazardous Waste
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Liability
Military
Native Organizations
Natives
Property
Rights
Uniform Rules
Warfare
Water
Weapons
Corporations
Environmental Concerns
Hazardous Substances
Hazardous Waste
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Liability
Military
Native Organizations
Natives
Property
Rights
Uniform Rules
Warfare
Water
Weapons