AK SB49 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-05-15 - FN4: (DHS)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to existing women's health programs; and defining 'medically necessary abortion' for purposes of making payments under the state Medicaid program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid Payment For Abortions; Terms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-14 - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to SSSB 49 am? (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-13 - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-13 - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-10 - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-10 - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-10 - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-15HouseFN4: (DHS)
2014-05-15HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266
2014-05-15HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
2014-05-15SenateLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
2014-04-17SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/16/14
2014-04-17SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 4/17 CHAPTER 8 SLA 14
2014-04-16Senate2:20 PM 4/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2014-04-14SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y13 N7
2014-04-14SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2014-04-13HouseVERSION: HCS SSSB 49(FIN) AM H
2014-04-13HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2014-04-13HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): REINBOLD
2014-04-13HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y23 N17
2014-04-13HouseRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2014-04-13HouseLYNN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2014-04-13HousePASSED Y23 N17
2014-04-13HouseIN THIRD READING
2014-04-10HouseHELD TO 4/13 CALENDAR
2014-04-10HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2014-04-10HouseAM NO 5 FAILED Y20 N20
2014-04-10HouseAM NO 4 FAILED Y18 N22
2014-04-10HouseAM NO 3 WITHDRAWN
2014-04-10HouseAM NO 3 OFFERED
2014-04-10HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y19 N21
2014-04-10House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2014-04-10HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y35 N5
2014-04-10HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-10HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS SSSB 49(FIN)
2014-04-09HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, HUGHES
2014-04-09HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR
2014-04-09HouseFIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-09HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-09HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2014
2014-02-28HouseFN4: (DHS)
2014-02-28HouseFN3: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
2014-02-28HouseFN2: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
2014-02-28HouseAM: MUNOZ
2014-02-28HouseDNP: GUTTENBERG, GARA, EDGMON, HOLMES, AUSTERMAN
2014-02-28HouseDP: NEUMAN, THOMPSON, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, STOLTZE
2014-02-28HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 23
2014-02-28HouseFIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 5DP 5DNP 1AM
2013-04-11HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
2013-04-11HouseFIN
2013-04-11HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2013-04-10SenateVERSION: SSSB 49 AM
2013-04-10SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2013-04-10SenateRECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
2013-04-09SenateCOGHILL NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2013-04-09SenatePASSED Y14 N6
2013-04-09SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2013-04-09SenateAM NO 4 FAILED Y6 N14
2013-04-09SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 UNAN CONSENT
2013-04-09SenateAM NO 3 FAILED Y7 N13
2013-04-09SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 3 UNAN CONSENT
2013-04-09SenateAM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2013-04-09SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
2013-04-09Senate...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2013-04-09SenateAM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2013-04-09SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
2013-04-09SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SSSB 49
2013-04-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR
2013-04-08SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2013-04-08SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2013
2013-04-01SenateFN1: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
2013-04-01SenateNR: BISHOP, HOFFMAN
2013-04-01SenateDP: KELLY, MEYER, DUNLEAVY, OLSON
2013-04-01SenateFIN RPT 4DP 2NR
2013-03-18SenateFN1: INDETERMINATE(DHS)
2013-03-18SenateDNP: WIELECHOWSKI
2013-03-18SenateDP: COGHILL, DYSON, OLSON
2013-03-18SenateJUD RPT 3DP 1DNP
2013-02-15SenateJUD, FIN
2013-02-15SenateSPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED-REFERRALS
2013-02-11SenateCOSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
2013-02-11SenateJUD, FIN
2013-02-11SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=28&bill=SB49
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0049A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0049B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0049C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0049D.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0049E.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/SB0049Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=SB49&jrn=1075&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=SB49&jrn=1079&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=SB49&jrn=1080&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=SB49&jrn=2336&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=SB49&jrn=2337&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=SB49&jrn=2343&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=SB49&jrn=2344&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=SB49&jrn=2411&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=SB49&jrn=2446&hse=S

Bill Comments

feedback