AK SB123 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-28 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-28 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing a municipality to adopt an ordinance prohibiting the use of cellular telephones while driving in school zones or on school property.
Title
Prohibit Use Of Cell Phone While Driving
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Meyer [R] | Sen. Peter Micciche [R] | Sen. Dennis Egan [D] | Sen. Alberta Gardner [D] |
Sen. Click Bishop [R] | Rep. Lindsey Holmes [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-28 | House | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-02-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2014-02-28 | House | NR: REINBOLD, LEDOUX |
2014-02-28 | House | DP: HERRON, OLSON, KITO III, NAGEAK |
2014-02-28 | House | CRA RPT 4DP 2NR |
2014-02-17 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOLMES |
2014-02-17 | House | CRA, JUD |
2014-02-17 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-02-14 | Senate | VERSION: SB 123 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER, BISHOP |
2014-02-14 | Senate | PASSED Y13 N2 E5 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 123 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/14 CALENDAR |
2014-02-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-02-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/12/2014 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2014-02-07 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, EGAN, BISHOP, GIESSEL |
2014-02-07 | Senate | CRA RPT 4DP |
2014-01-31 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, EGAN |
2014-01-22 | Senate | CRA |
2014-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |