AK HCR28 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning Senate Bill No. 138, relating to the purposes, powers, and duties of the Alaska Gasline Development Corporation; relating to an in-state natural gas pipeline, an Alaska liquefied natural gas project, and associated funds; requiring state agencies and other entities to expedite reviews and actions related to natural gas pipelines and projects; relating to the authorities and duties of the commissioner of natural resources relating to a North Slope natural gas project, oil and gas and gas only leases, and royalty gas and other gas received by the state including gas received as payment for the production tax on gas; relating to the tax on oil and gas production, on oil production, and on gas production; relating to the duties of the commissioner of revenue relating to a North Slope natural gas project and gas received as payment for tax; relating to confidential information and public record status of information provided to or in the custody of the Department of Natural Resources and the Department of Revenue; relating to apportionment factors of the Alaska Net Income Tax Act; amending the definition of gross value at the "point of production" for gas for purposes of the oil and gas production tax; clarifying that the exploration incentive credit, the oil or gas producer education credit, and the film production tax credit may not be taken against the gas production tax paid in gas; relating to the oil or gas producer education credit; requesting the governor to establish an interim advisory board to advise the governor on municipal involvement in a North Slope natural gas project; relating to the development of a plan by the Alaska Energy Authority for developing infrastructure to deliver affordable energy to areas of the state that will not have direct access to a North Slope natural gas pipeline and a recommendation of a funding source for energy infrastructure development; establishing the Alaska affordable energy fund; requiring the commissioner of revenue to develop a plan and suggest legislation for municipalities, regional corporations, and residents of the state to acquire ownership interests in a North Slope natural gas pipeline project; and making conforming amendments.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Sb 138
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-20 | Senate | VERSION: HCR 28 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-20 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-20 | Senate | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-04-20 | House | VERSION: HCR 28 |
2014-04-20 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-20 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2014-04-20 | House | BEFORE THE HOUSE |
2014-04-19 | House | HELD TO 4/20 CALENDAR |
2014-04-19 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2014-04-19 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2014 |
2014-04-11 | House | RLS FOR CALENDARING |
2014-04-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Contracts
Disclosure
Funds
Leases
Oil & Gas
Pipelines
Public Corporations
Public Records
Resources
Revenue
Taxation
Uniform Rules
Disclosure
Funds
Leases
Oil & Gas
Pipelines
Public Corporations
Public Records
Resources
Revenue
Taxation
Uniform Rules