AK HCR27 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning Senate Bill No. 64, relating to theft and property offenses; relating to the definition of "prior convictions" for certain theft offenses; establishing the Alaska Criminal Justice Commission and providing an expiration date; relating to the crime of custodial interference; relating to the duties of the Alaska Judicial Council; relating to jail-time credit for offenders in court-ordered treatment programs; relating to conditions of release, probation, and parole; relating to duties of the commissioner of corrections and board of parole; establishing a fund for reducing recidivism in the Department of Health and Social Services; requiring the commissioner of health and social services to establish programs for persons on conditions of release or probation that require testing for controlled substances and alcoholic beverages; requiring the board of parole to establish programs for persons on parole that require testing for controlled substances and alcoholic beverages; and relating to the duties of the Department of Health and Social Services.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Sb 64
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-22 | Senate | VERSION: HCR 27 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-22 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-22 | Senate | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-04-22 | House | VERSION: HCR 27 |
2014-04-22 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-20 | House | VERSION: HCR 27 |
2014-04-20 | House | ENGROSSED |
2014-04-20 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2014-04-20 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-20 | House | RULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 4/20/14 |
2014-04-10 | House | RLS FOR CALENDARING |
2014-04-10 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alcohol
Boards & Commissions
Corrections
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Drugs
Health & Social Services
Judges
Public Safety
Sentencing
Uniform Rules
Boards & Commissions
Corrections
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Drugs
Health & Social Services
Judges
Public Safety
Sentencing
Uniform Rules