AK HB69 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/21/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 23-2)
Status: Passed on September 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/21/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act prohibiting state and municipal agencies from using assets to implement or aid in the implementation of the requirements of certain federal statutes, regulations, rules, and orders that are applied to infringe on a person's right to bear arms or right to due process or that implement or aid in the implementation of the federal REAL ID Act of 2005; exempting certain firearms, firearm accessories, and ammunition in this state from federal regulation; declaring certain federal statutes, regulations, rules, and orders unconstitutional under the Constitution of the United States and unenforceable in this state; requiring the attorney general to file any legal action to prevent implementation of a federal statute, regulation, rule, or order that violates the rights of a resident of the state; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Federal Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate: SCS CSHB 69(JUD) Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate: SCS CSHB 69(JUD) Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-10 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/21/13 |
2013-09-10 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 52 SLA 13 |
2013-06-24 | House | 11:51 AM 6/13/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-04-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-11 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y34 N5 E1 |
2013-04-11 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2013-04-11 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2013-04-10 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 69(JUD) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2013-04-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-10 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N3 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 69(JUD) |
2013-04-09 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, MEYER, MICCICHE |
2013-04-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR |
2013-04-09 | Senate | JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-09 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-09 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-06 | Senate | FN6: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-04-06 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(LAW) |
2013-04-06 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(COR) |
2013-04-06 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, DYSON |
2013-04-06 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 6 |
2013-04-06 | Senate | JUD RPT SCS 3DP NEW TITLE |
2013-02-28 | Senate | JUD |
2013-02-28 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-02-27 | House | VERSION: CSHB 69(JUD) |
2013-02-27 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2013-02-27 | House | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2013-02-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON |
2013-02-25 | House | TUCK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2013-02-25 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-02-25 | House | PASSED Y31 N5 E4 |
2013-02-25 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 69(JUD) |
2013-02-25 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-02-25 | House | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-02-25 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-02-25 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/25/2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN |
2013-02-20 | House | FN3: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-02-20 | House | FN2: ZERO(LAW) |
2013-02-20 | House | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2013-02-20 | House | NR: GRUENBERG |
2013-02-20 | House | DP: MILLETT, PRUITT, LYNN, FOSTER, LEDOUX, KELLER |
2013-02-20 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 6DP 1NR |
2013-02-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2013-01-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD |
2013-01-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STOLTZE |
2013-01-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES |
2013-01-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, FOSTER |
2013-01-18 | House | BILL REPRINTED 1/17/13 |
2013-01-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S) CORRECTED: ADD HIGGINS; REMOVE HUGHES |
2013-01-16 | House | JUD |
2013-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Attorney General
Courts
Crimes
Executive Branch
Funds
Intergovernmental Relations
Licensing
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Finance
Rights
Weapons
Courts
Crimes
Executive Branch
Funds
Intergovernmental Relations
Licensing
Privacy
Public Employees
Public Finance
Rights
Weapons