AK HB36 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progress
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/9/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to ballot initiative proposal applications, to ballot initiatives and to those who file or organize for the purpose of filing a ballot initiative proposal, and to election pamphlet information relating to certain propositions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Initiatives: Contributions/ Procedures

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-09 EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/9/10
2010-07-09 SIGNED INTO LAW 6/11 CHAPTER 73 SLA 10
2010-07-09 2:19 PM 6/7/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2010-07-09 MANIFEST ERROR(S)
2010-04-18 CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 A4
2010-04-18 CONCUR MESSAGE
2010-04-18 VERSION: SCS CSSSHB 36(JUD)
2010-04-18 TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2010-04-18 PASSED Y19 N1
2010-04-18 READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSSSHB 36(JUD)
2010-04-18 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-18 JUD SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-18 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-04-18 FN5: (ADM)
2010-04-18 FN3: ZERO(GOV)
2010-04-18 FN2: ZERO(GOV)
2010-04-18 NR: STEDMAN, THOMAS, OLSON
2010-04-18 DNP: ELLIS
2010-04-18 DP: HOFFMAN, HUGGINS, EGAN
2010-04-18 FIN RPT SCS(JUD) 3DP 1DNP 3NR
2010-04-18 MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2010-04-18 RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2010
2010-04-18 FN5: (ADM)
2010-04-18 FN3: ZERO(GOV)
2010-04-18 FN2: ZERO(GOV)
2010-04-18 NR: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN
2010-04-18 DP: COGHILL
2010-04-18 JUD RPT SCS 1DP 3NR SAME TITLE
2010-04-12 JUD, FIN
2010-04-12 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2010-04-11 VERSION: CSSSHB 36(FIN) AM
2010-04-11 TRANSMITTED TO (S)
2010-04-11 PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 N5
2010-04-11 RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
2010-04-10 COSPONSOR(S): KELLER, MUNOZ
2010-04-10 GRUENBERG NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2010-04-10 PASSED Y30 N9 A1
2010-04-10 AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2010-04-10 AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y22 N17 A1
2010-04-10 RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-10 READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 36(FIN)
2010-04-09 COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN
2010-04-09 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR
2010-04-09 FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-09 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-04-09 RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2010
2010-03-19 FN4: (ADM)
2010-03-19 FN3: ZERO(GOV)
2010-03-19 FN2: ZERO(GOV)
2010-03-19 AM: GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, N.FOSTER
2010-03-19 DP: THOMAS, AUSTERMAN, KELLY, FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE, HAWKER
2010-03-19 FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 4AM
2009-04-18 COSPONSOR(S): KELLY
2009-04-16 FN1: ZERO(GOV)
2009-04-16 AM: LYNN
2009-04-16 NR: DAHLSTROM
2009-04-16 DNP: HOLMES, GRUENBERG, RAMRAS
2009-04-16 DP: COGHILL
2009-04-16 JUD RPT CS(JUD) 1DP 3DNP 1NR 1AM
2009-03-25 JUD, FIN
2009-03-25 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2009-03-25 SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
2009-01-20 STA, JUD
2009-01-20 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2009-01-20 PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback