AK HB309 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-14 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/12/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-14 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/12/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to distillery licenses.
Title
Distillery Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/12/14 |
2014-07-14 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/14 CHAPTER 82 SLA 14 |
2014-07-14 | House | 9:39 AM 7/14 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 309(L&C) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-17 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FRENCH, MCGUIRE, GARDNER, BISHOP, EGAN, MICCICHE, STEDMAN |
2014-04-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 309(L&C) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2014-04-16 | Senate | DP: DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE |
2014-04-16 | Senate | L&C RPT 2DP 1NR |
2014-04-11 | Senate | L&C |
2014-04-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-11 | House | VERSION: CSHB 309(L&C) |
2014-04-11 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON |
2014-04-11 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y29 N5 E3 A3 |
2014-04-11 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2014-04-11 | House | TUCK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2014-04-11 | House | PASSED Y30 N4 E3 A3 |
2014-04-11 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 309(L&C) |
2014-04-11 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-11 | House | L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-10 | House | HELD TO 4/11 CALENDAR |
2014-04-10 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-10 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2014-04-10 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2014-04-03 | House | NR: CHENAULT, HERRON, REINBOLD, SADDLER |
2014-04-03 | House | DP: MILLETT, JOSEPHSON, OLSON |
2014-04-03 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 3DP 4NR |
2014-04-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO |
2014-04-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, GATTIS |
2014-03-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2014-02-17 | House | L&C |
2014-02-17 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |