AK HB287 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the determination of the royalty received by the state on oil production refined or processed in the state; providing tax credits for qualified infrastructure expenditures for in-state refineries; approving and ratifying the sale of royalty oil by the State of Alaska to Tesoro Corporation and Tesoro Refining and Marketing Company LLC; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Oil Royalties; Tax Credit
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - House - House: Concur (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 4 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: SCS CSHB 287(FIN) Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 9 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 4 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: SCS CSHB 287(FIN) Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 9 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2014-04-21 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2014-04-21 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-21 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y32 N7 A1 |
2014-04-21 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2014-04-20 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2014-04-20 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-20 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 287(FIN) |
2014-04-20 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-20 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-20 | Senate | PASSED Y14 N6 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 287(FIN) |
2014-04-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-20 | Senate | AM NO 7 FAILED Y4 N16 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | AM NO 6 FAILED Y4 N16 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | AM NO 5 FAILED Y5 N15 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | AM NO 4 FAILED Y6 N14 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | AM NO 3 FAILED Y5 N14 A1 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | AM NO 2 FAILED Y6 N13 A1 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N14 A1 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-20 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-20 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/2014 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | FN5: INDTERMINATE(REV) |
2014-04-20 | Senate | FN2: INDETERMINATE(DNR) |
2014-04-20 | Senate | NR: MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, DUNLEAVY, HOFFMAN |
2014-04-20 | Senate | DP: KELLY, BISHOP, OLSON |
2014-04-20 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 31 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 3DP 4NR NEW TITLE |
2014-04-17 | Senate | FIN |
2014-04-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-17 | House | VERSION: CSHB 287(RLS) AM |
2014-04-17 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 N5 |
2014-04-17 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2014-04-17 | House | JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2014-04-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-17 | House | PASSED Y35 N5 |
2014-04-17 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2014-04-17 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N31 |
2014-04-17 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-17 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING |
2014-04-17 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-17 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 287(RLS) |
2014-04-16 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/17 CALENDAR |
2014-04-16 | House | RLS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-16 | House | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/16/14 |
2014-04-16 | House | FN4: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2014-04-16 | House | FN2: INDETERMINATE(DNR) |
2014-04-16 | House | NR: HAWKER, OLSON, KELLER, GRUENBERG, HERRON, JOHNSON |
2014-04-16 | House | DP: CHENAULT |
2014-04-16 | House | RLS RPT CS(RLS) NT 1DP 6NR |
2014-04-15 | House | FN3: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2014-04-15 | House | FN2: INDETERMINATE(DNR) |
2014-04-15 | House | AM: GUTTENBERG, GARA, COSTELLO |
2014-04-15 | House | NR: MUNOZ, NEUMAN, EDGMON, HOLMES, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN |
2014-04-15 | House | DP: T.WILSON, THOMPSON |
2014-04-15 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 2DP 6NR 3AM |
2014-03-10 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(DNR) |
2014-03-10 | House | DP: JOHNSON, P.WILSON, OLSON, TARR, SEATON, HAWKER |
2014-03-10 | House | RES RPT 6DP |
2014-01-29 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2014-01-29 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(DNR) |
2014-01-29 | House | RES, FIN |
2014-01-29 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |