AK HB189 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-31 - COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to hazing.
Title
Hazing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2014-03-31 | House | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-03-31 | House | FN5: INDETERMINATE(LAW) |
2014-03-31 | House | FN4: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2014-03-31 | House | FN3: ZERO(EED) |
2014-03-31 | House | FN2: ZERO(COR) |
2014-03-31 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-03-31 | House | NR: LEDOUX, SADDLER, GATTIS |
2014-03-31 | House | DP: P.WILSON, SEATON, DRUMMOND |
2014-03-31 | House | EDC RPT CS(EDC) 3DP 3NR |
2014-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KITO III |
2013-04-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GATTIS |
2013-03-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NAGEAK |
2013-03-27 | House | EDC, JUD |
2013-03-27 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |