AK HB103 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-01 - COSPONSOR(S): TARR
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-01 - COSPONSOR(S): TARR
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act setting special registration fees for alternative fuel vehicles; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Fee/tax Exemption For Certain Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2013-02-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2013-02-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA |
2013-02-06 | House | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2013-02-06 | House | TRA, FIN |
2013-02-06 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=28&bill=HB103 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HB0103A.PDF |